Trustees WETHERBY ST JAMES CHURCH CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 1133514

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Jenkins | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lorna Earle | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Neil Stobert | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Peat | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Derek Brown | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Goodall | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Hibbert | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Hugh Turner | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Williams | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Hilary Bailey | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Kemp | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Startup | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Kerel Hainsworth | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Kathryn Wenn | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Emma Clare Beddoe | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN DEBORAH TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|||||
ALAN GRIMES | Trustee | 21 June 2012 |
|
|||||
VAL LUMSDEN | Trustee | 07 May 2011 |
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES HASKINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEAN HEATON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARILYN SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID ANDREW BEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.