Trustees COTTENHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1136992

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Bailey | Chair | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Bertram John Faben | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Baggett | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Cole | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wells | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Michelle Ray | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Clare Smith | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES KILSBY | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Main | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Dearman | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Cook | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CANDICE OLESZCZUK | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA RICHARDSON | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNA HERVEY MURRAY | Trustee | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA MILES | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.