THE LITTLE WINGS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Providing medical assistance to children, living in the Middle East and North Africa, who have musculoskeletal deformities. 2) Offer support to small individual projects that focus on the treatment of children with specific limb deformities. 3) Conduct education and awareness campaigns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 12 October 2010: Standard registration
- TLWF (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haya Shahin | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marc Francis Sinclair | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Seonaid Biagioni | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maher Roz | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN BEALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.22k | £428 | £850 | £43.57k | £13.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.58k | £11.07k | £1.14k | £48.05k | £24.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED 14 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 18 LIVING IN ASIA, INCLUDING THE MIDDLE EAST, AND AFRICA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITH LIMB DEFORMITIES, ACQUIRED OR CONGENITAL, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL TREATMENT, EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LIMB DEFORMITIES, THEREBY INCREASING THE EARLY DETECTION OF CHILDREN'S LIMB DEFORMITIES (3) TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND FACILITATE CLINICAL RESEARCH RELATING TO LIMB DEFORMITIES IN CHILDREN WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
ASIA, THE MIDDLE EAST, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
THAMES EXCHANGE
10 QUEEN STREET PLACE
LONDON
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- +44 (0) 7731741026
- Email:
- admin@thelittlewings.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window