THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET LOWESTOFT

Charity Number: 1134063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Parish Church of Lowestoft

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £370,016
Total expenditure: £205,426

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Simon Stokes Chair 28 March 2023
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ESTATE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Linda Friston Trustee 06 April 2025
D C MONCRIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Richard Allen Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Jennifer Joan Dyer Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Derek Spall Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Robert Mackenzie Linton Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Gill Battrick Trustee 06 April 2025
None on record
Caroline Bentley Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Capt. John Worsfold Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Michael Gall Trustee 14 April 2024
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ESTATE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
THE LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
Michelle Morris Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
CHRISTINE LEECH Trustee 14 March 2024
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ESTATE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
THE LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: 1 day late
LOWESTOFT CHURCH AND TOWN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GERDA BUCKLEY Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Rachel McDonough Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Mary Carr Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Maureen Waterton Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Sarah Spall Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Jonathan Williams Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record
Malcolm Howes Trustee 16 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £115.41k £123.93k £111.61k £131.53k £370.02k
Total expenditure £118.40k £110.35k £130.52k £170.46k £205.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 April 2023 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 April 2023 164 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Margarets Church Hall
Hollingsworth Road
LOWESTOFT
NR32 4BW
Phone:
01502573046