THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY APOSTLES, CHARLTON KINGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian mission and ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY APOSTLES PCC, CHARLTON KINGS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ashley Stuart Collishaw | Chair | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
John Robinson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Horton | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth FIONA FOULGER | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Emily Burns-Preston | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon William Minden Dye | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Short | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Watson Stott | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Yiend | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Naylor | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hall | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Oriel Wilson | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Cumming-Bruce | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Rachel Beere | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Foulger | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.83k | £225.14k | £236.97k | £192.66k | £274.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.18k | £209.25k | £213.38k | £215.44k | £228.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Of The Holy Apostle
London Road
Charlton Kings
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 6HW
- Phone:
- 01242242570
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window