GOODWILL786CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping poor people in Philippines.muslims and non muslim alike our help is extendid to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Albania
- Bangladesh
- India
- Philippines
Governance
- 06 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamila Atcha | Chair | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amina Jeewa | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Faatemah Seedat | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rehma Akram | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ASGHAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £500 | £816 | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 360 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT IF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHILIPPINES, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF PLACES OF WORSHIP AND EDUCATING PEOPLE IN THE MUSLIM RELIGION. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE PHILIPPINES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Area of benefit
PHILIPPINES,
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Birkdale Gardens
BOLTON
BL3 5ES
- Phone:
- 07814486961
- Email:
- info@goodwill786.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.