Stretton Parish

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stretton Parish provides * regular public worship open to all * sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation * pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved * teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups * taking of religious assemblies in schools * youth clubs with a Christian ethos * supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

21 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 04 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CHURCH STRETTON PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, CHURCH STRETTON (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Jackson | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Robinson | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edmunds | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Roberts | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gail Dyer | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Graham | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Shuttleworth | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Foster | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Robinson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moira Matthews | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Braddick | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Andrews | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine McCrohan | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wallis | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Lawton | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Christobel Hargraves | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Johnson | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Watson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steve King | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Vince | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Allen | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.76k | £220.23k | £262.71k | £306.95k | £277.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £293.47k | £275.47k | £304.22k | £334.00k | £283.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 01 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Laurence's Church
The Parish Office
Church Street
CHURCH STRETTON
SY6 6DQ
- Phone:
- 01694724224
- Email:
- office@strettonparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window