THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE WITH ALL SAINTS. HAWKHURST

Charity number: 1134439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of the whole mission of the Church in the parish of Hawkhurst and maintaining St Laurence Church through a range of services on both Sundays and during the week. As well as the regular services, which all are welcome to attend the Church is open every day for anyone to enter for private prayer and contemplation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £130,872
Total expenditure: £126,704

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST LAURENCE PCC, HAWKHURST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND RODNEY GRANVILLE DREYER Chair
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Dorothy Elizabeth Lesley Hatcher Trustee 27 April 2025
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Elixzabeth Claire Roberts Trustee 21 April 2024
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Lydia Henriette Klein Trustee 21 April 2024
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Norma Jean Crowe Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Ann Henderson Trustee 19 July 2022
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Susan Diane Ma Trustee 17 May 2022
None on record
Stephen Ringer Trustee 24 April 2022
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Sarah Louise Lindop Trustee 23 May 2021
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Nana Twym-Ampofo Trustee 01 November 2020
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Kwame Appiah-Peprah Trustee 01 November 2020
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Jane Cooper Trustee 22 April 2018
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER MURRAY WYLLIE Trustee 30 April 2017
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
FELICITY MARY ROBINSON Trustee 25 August 2013
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
LYNN PATRICIA MANSELL Trustee 25 August 2013
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
KENT GRAHAM HARRIES Trustee 11 September 2012
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ALISON PATRICIA PARSONS Trustee
CANON JEFFREY'S CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.47k £120.84k £123.32k £144.56k £130.87k
Total expenditure £129.83k £117.38k £121.31k £134.49k £126.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Laurence Church
The Moor
Hawkhurst
CRANBROOK
TN18 4NT
Phone:
01580753397