TEMPLE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the church are set within the context of the Methodist Church policy of Our Calling.The church exists: to increase awareness of God's presence and to celebrate God's love; to to help people to grow and to learn as Christians through mutual support and care;to be a good neighbour to people in need and to challenge injustice;and to make more followers of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEBORAH MARY KIRK | Chair | 05 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Hazel Mary Jordan | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Rigg | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Turner | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Conrad Graham Marks | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
George Adams | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Broadley | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Hartley | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Rossiter | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Rossiter | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
SHEILA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
COLIN ROBERTSON | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RON JORDAN | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Mitchell | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|||||||
KATHRYN TURNER | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|||||||
ANTHONY BELL | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DIANA MARGARET ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARGARET ANN SWEET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANNE JORDAN BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DOREEN BETTY MARKS CERT. ED. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MR GRAHAM DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
LYNDA PRIMROSE SPURRETT KAZER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.64k | £96.99k | £95.54k | £131.49k | £161.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.77k | £113.07k | £92.40k | £112.97k | £120.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Temple Methodist Church
Upper High Street
TAUNTON
TA1 3PY
- Phone:
- 01823275765
- Email:
- enquiries@templetaunton.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window