NORTHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Northampton Methodist Circuit currently consists of 13 Christian Communities, committed to Worship, Fellowship, Social Action And Evangelism, Mutual Support and Connexional belonging. (There are 10 Methodist and 3 Ecumenical Congregations involving Methodists) We aim, guided by God, to promote active growth and explore New Ways of being church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 April 2010: Previously excepted registration
- THE METHODIST CHURCH, NORTHAMPTON CIRCUIT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David John Speirs | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Charmaine Wareham-Voyce | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Patricia Ann Oliver | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Hilary Walden | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Paul James Deakin | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Frances Perry | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Dr Hellen Oluoko Okello | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Philip Neil Leeson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
JENNIFER BROOKS | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Deanne Kirkland | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Rev Alan Sharp | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH EASON | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
TREVOR JOHN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS M TIMMS | Trustee |
|
||||||||
William Keith BROOKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.27k | £247.89k | £252.83k | £236.55k | £245.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.81k | £405.17k | £251.55k | £265.08k | £352.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harpole Methodist Church
School Lane
Harpole
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 4DR
- Phone:
- 01604 702178
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window