ROYAL LONDON YACHT CLUB YOUTH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and training of young persons up to the age of 25 years, from the Isle of Wight, in sailing, boat handling, seamanship and navigation. To help the beneficiaries develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 22 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RODNEY JOHN CAWS BARTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROGER IAN DUCKWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN TAYLOR OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.66k | £1.71k | £2.10k | £8.40k | £7.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.99k | £1.05k | £1.15k | £7.80k | £5.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PERSONS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, PRIMARILY FROM THE ISLE OF WIGHT, IN SAILING, BOAT HANDLING, SEAMANSHIP AND NAVIGATION. B TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR BY HELPING TO SEND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO COULD OTHERWISE NOT AFFORD IT, ON CHARACTER BUILDING MARITIME ACTIVITIES C TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR BURSARIES FOR SUCH ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL LONDON YACHT CLUB
THE PARADE
COWES
PO31 7QS
- Phone:
- 01983299727
- Email:
- secretary@rlyc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window