METHODIST CHURCH REDHILL AND EAST GRINSTEAD CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of sacred places (buildings) for prayer and contemplation. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas financially
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

28 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Bentley | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Ann Ford | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Susan Nelson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev Benjamin Scrivens | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer Margaret Barnes | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Carol O'Donnell | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Edison Madakudya | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gill George | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Collins | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Gillian Baalham | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rev Elisabeth Brooks | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Helen Greaves | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
PAUL RICHARD FOX | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Joyce Elizabeth Jordan | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
PAULINE JANET NEWTON | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Jacqui Waters | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David John Hewer | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Simon Harold Bruce | Trustee | 26 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH MARY GREGORY | Trustee | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Patricia Kathleen Oakley | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
CLIVE PETER COLEMAN | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew Robert Willock | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|||||||
IAN PATTISON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR C G RIDGWAY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS R E WILLOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR K J NEWBURY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MRS S JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||||
REV C MCKIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £444.32k | £320.84k | £356.01k | £301.62k | £282.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.31k | £318.08k | £338.79k | £359.09k | £343.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 August 2020 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 August 2020 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redhill Methodist Church
Gloucester Road
Redhill
RH1 1BP
- Phone:
- 01737771323
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window