KENSINGTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Church shall be:- (1) the advancement of the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Faith primarily but not exclusively within Bristol and the surrounding neighbourhood; and (2) such other charitable purposes as shall, in the opinion of the Managing Trustees further the work of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,277 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART HEAP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janet Karanja | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Mary Elms | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Paul Andrews | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dodson | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Lewis Arnoldi Morrison | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joannie Nakakawa Hampson | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Adrian Andrew | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Dyer | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon Matthew Woods | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PRICE | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW HOWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR FEMO OGUNNIYI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP HODGES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £414.24k | £374.19k | £448.08k | £400.32k | £382.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £412.47k | £369.13k | £355.37k | £514.02k | £385.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.17k | £2.13k | N/A | £2.00k | £8.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITH BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD, AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kensington Baptist Church
208 Stapleton Road
BRISTOL
BS5 0NX
- Phone:
- 01179511202
- Email:
- officeadmin@kenbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window