Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OTTERSHAW
Charity number: 1134029

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Mark Sheehan | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Mark Richard Anthony Potter | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Linda Mary Lyons | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr David Paul North-Coombes | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart Ross Logan | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Denise Caroline Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Pearson | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Philip Scott | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
ROGER LEONARD PASHLEY | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
LESLEY PATRICIA MATTHEWS | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Olivia Towie | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
GERALYN LOGAN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.