FIREHOUSE CREATIVE PRODUCTIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We create cutting-edge new theatre inspired by real life stories. All of our projects have been created with a dedication to widening access to the creative process at its core. We are developing our charityÔÇÖs work with elderly people suffering from isolation, with young people with serious illnesses, and further in the field of conflict resolution.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 March 2010: Standard registration
- 07 November 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.06k | £824 | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £2.44k | £515 | £3.98k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 FEB 2010
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, IN PARTICULAR BY ACTIVELY INVOLVING THOSE SECTORS OF THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE UNDERSERVED BY THE ARTS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window