THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ALDRIDGE, DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of young people's clubs and activities. Promoting the whole mission of the church through activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£516,879
Donations and legacies | £393.42k | |
Charitable activities | £88.87k | |
Other trading activities | £28.05k | |
Investments | £1.65k | |
Other | £4.89k |
Total expenditure:
£550,507
Raising funds | £20 | |
Charitable activities | £550.49k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20 | |
Charitable expenditure | £550.49k |
People

14 Employee(s)
26 Trustee(s)
154 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
- ALDRIDGE PCC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Roberts | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Bryant | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Leech | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Matthews-Dibbins | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Chapman | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ford | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Peel | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Luik | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Wilkes | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
GLENNYS DAVIS | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CLAYTON | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN HARRISON | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN BALDWIN | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ford | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER STANFORD | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARIE PARKER | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID SIMS | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JEREMY DICKSON | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr COLIN KERBOTSON FLENLEY | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patrick Stephen Doel | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Jennifer Grundy | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Kate Mason | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GILMOUR CHALMERS | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP JOHN YOUNG | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN FRANCIS HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £551.52k | £525.59k | £486.24k | £533.12k | £516.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £570.43k | £579.33k | £522.63k | £527.91k | £550.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.00k | £25.81k | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £422.50k | £439.35k | N/A | £409.63k | £393.42k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £21.19k | £10.86k | N/A | £29.54k | £28.05k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £107.68k | £75.29k | N/A | £1.38k | £88.87k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £152 | £95 | N/A | £182 | £1.65k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £92.39k | £4.89k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £1.00k | N/A | £19.03k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £568.66k | £579.11k | N/A | £448.25k | £550.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.77k | £224 | N/A | £1.02k | £20 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.92k | £3.36k | N/A | £3.30k | £3.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £54.90k | £14.95k | N/A | £16.26k | £17.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £78.64k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.12m | £1.09m | N/A | £1.03m | £1.00m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £256.94k | £232.89k | N/A | £248.92k | £246.35k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £43.32k | £40.52k | N/A | £26.24k | £32.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES"
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 THE GREEN
ALDRIDGE
WALSALL
WS9 8NH
- Phone:
- 01922455229
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window