THE FRIENDS OF THE JOHN MOORE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities in order to make donations to the school towards purchases of equipment or support for activities to enhance the pupils education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Avery | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Corbett | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Craig | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dina Summers | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Carter | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chantel Merrick | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stefanie Nash | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Taylor | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neville Thomas | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.92k | £5.45k | £7.97k | £9.39k | £9.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £2.81k | £5.81k | £15.85k | £8.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 July 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
To advance the education of pupils in the School in particular by: Developing effective relationships between the staff parents and others associated with the school; Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the School and advance the education of the pupils.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLUMBINE ROAD
WALTON CARDIFF
TEWKESBURY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL20 7SP
- Phone:
- 07530831593
- Email:
- Friends.jmps@gmail.com
- Website:
-
thejohnmooreprimary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window