CHRISTIAN REVIVAL CENTRE MINISTRY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a place for people to come and worship, council people who have problems in their daily lives and also guide the teenagers by encouraging them to be better citizens in the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 20 July 2010: Standard registration
- 21 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CRCM-CHRISTIAN REVIVAL CENTRE MINISTRY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £2.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 04 February 2014 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 04 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES, TEACHING OF THE BIBLE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. B) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, AS A MEANS OF: (I) DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (III) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (IV) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES. C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN POOR COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window