BIRTLEY COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Birtley Community Partnership is an umbrella group for all the Churches, Schools, voluntary Groups and Businesses within the Birtley area. We work together to promote the benefits of the people of Birtley without distinction. We work with statutory and voluntary organisations in a common effort to improve the physical and economic conditions of life in the Birtley area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £41,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
Governance
- 21 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAZEL WEATHERLEY | Chair | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Barry Gray | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Gray | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Turner | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thornton | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.33k | £90.88k | £107.19k | £119.37k | £88.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.96k | £44.89k | £87.86k | £94.00k | £106.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.35k | £5.86k | £20.79k | £47.00k | £41.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
3.1 PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BIRTLEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY BRINGING TOGETHER STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE BIRTLEY AREA AND TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 3.2 PROMOTE ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THE CHARITY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN.
Area of benefit
BIRTLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birtley Community Partnership
16 Harraton Terrace
Durham Road
Birtley
CHESTER LE STREET
DH3 2QG
- Phone:
- 01914920434
- Email:
- admin@thebirtleyhub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window