Trustees CARERS ADVICE & RESOURCE ESTABLISHMENT, SANDWELL (CARES)
Charity Number: 1134409

Charity is in administration
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT STANLEY ADAMS | Chair | 27 September 2013 |
|
|||||
Rose Flemming | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Kiernan | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Cash | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA SMITH | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ESTWICK | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET WHITWORTH | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MALONEY JEWKES | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.