CRAWLEY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching; Evangelism and mission, locally, regionally, nationally and internationally; Nurture and growth of Christian disciples; Education and training for Christian and community service; Giving and encouraging pastoral care; Supporting and encouraging charitable social action in the United Kingdom and abroad;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN DENNIS PHILLIPS | Chair | 01 September 2000 |
|
|
||||
Roney Richard Soloman | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Vincent | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LESLIE POOLE | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Munt | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Mary Golightly | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Graham Durrant | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADE ADEROUNMU | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE LINDRIDGE | Trustee | 01 September 2000 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA MARY WARNER | Trustee | 01 September 1994 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.73k | £383.58k | £366.49k | £346.07k | £369.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338.78k | £358.84k | £371.51k | £376.08k | £415.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crawley Baptist Church
Crabtree Road
West Green
Crawley
RH11 7HJ
- Phone:
- 01293546177
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window