FREE CHURCH ST. JUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship on Sundays, weekly prayer group and Bible study, chess club, community cafe, charity shop, internet access available, all with intentional Christian outreach in mind. More activities being planned. Please check Facebook page for updated information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK PRICHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.47k | £9.68k | £18.58k | £21.18k | £26.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.66k | £15.62k | £14.35k | £21.76k | £21.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH REFERENCE DEED 27 OCTOBER 1898
Charitable objects
The trustees for the time being shall at all times permit the said Premises and the Chapel School or other buildings from time to time standing thereon to be used and occupied and enjoyed as a place for the Public Worship of God and for the instruction of children and adults under the direction of the Society or Church assembling for worship thereon in connection with the said Denomination or Connexion according to the Principles Constitution Usages Polity and Rules from time to time of the said Denomination and also for the promotion of such other religious, educational or charitable purposes as the said Society or Church shall from time to time direct.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mergh Gwyn
Cape Cornwall Road
ST. JUST
PENZANCE
TR19 7JX
- Phone:
- 01736787590
- Email:
- info@stjustfreechurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window