ROTHERHAM HOLIDAY AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various fund raising activities such as concerts, appeals for donations from business and private sources in order to help finance the holidays awarded.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Rotherham
Governance
- 19 March 2010: Standard registration
- RHA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Leanne Ewens | Chair | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WHALING | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Cragg | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Mary Taylor | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LES TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.33k | £14.62k | £1.69k | £4.82k | £3.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £5.00k | £30.00k | £180 | £7.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ENABLE DISADVANTAGED FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN LIVING IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROTHERHAM TO ENJOY A FAMILY HOLIDAY. 2.2 TO ACHIEVE THIS BY WORKING CLOSELY WITH LOCAL CHURCHES, ROTHERHAM CHRISTIANS UNEMPLOYMENT GROUP, TRAVEL AGENTS, ROTHERHAM HEALTH COMMUNITY, ROTHERHAM METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL AND THE BUSINESS COMMUNITY. 2.3 TO WORK WITH THE FAMILY HOLIDAY ASSOCIATION (A NATIONAL CHARITY REGISTERED WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS) AND ANY OTHER NATIONAL OR LOCAL BODY THAT CAN ASSIST IN FURTHERING THE AIMS OF ROTHERHAM HOLIDAY AID.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 8 Sheffield Business Park
Europa Way
Sheffield
S9 1XH
- Phone:
- 07711418111
- Email:
- JOHNWHALING@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window