THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. NICHOLAS, CRAMLINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's currrent activities embrace the spiritual, legal, financial, pastoral and missionary functions of a Church of England parish in Cramlington, Northumberland and in the Anglican Diocese of Newcastle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PARISH OF CRAMLINGTON PCC (Working name)
- St Nicholas' Church Cramlington. (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danny Edward Pritchard-Shepherd | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessamyn Ruth Luscombe | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Lara Spence | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Dawson | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Stanners | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Buxton | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kit Tapscott | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Agnes Docherty | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Leigh Rebel | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Stewart | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol-Ann Grey | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Wyness | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Brierley | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marion Maxwell | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dilys Mary Nicholls | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.68k | £141.00k | £112.99k | £133.37k | £139.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.21k | £122.57k | £111.18k | £114.75k | £129.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.00k | N/A | £10.00k | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Carew Court
CRAMLINGTON
Northumberland
NE23 6DZ
- Phone:
- 07710 983 094
- Email:
- cramlingtoncofe@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window