GAAP ORPHANAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current activities includes visiting established orphanages in Nigeria that lacks good standards and supporting them with the implementation of good Corporate Governance. We provide orphanages with supplies such as clothes, educational items, medical supplies, human resources, food, water supply and general organisational supports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 06 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABBEY OREBANWO FCCA CeMap | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Roger Simon | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
TERRY LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOUGLAS ELOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY SNOW BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.34k | £9.52k | £7.12k | £3.91k | £4.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.94k | £4.93k | £4.51k | £3.69k | £3.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 01 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE FOUNDATION IS ESTABLISHED IS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST ORPHANS AND ABANDONED CHILDREN IN AFRICA.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
492 GALE STREET
DAGENHAM
RM9 4NU
- Phone:
- 07956383606
- Email:
- info@gaaporphanage.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window