THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN PARISH CHURCH WESTERHAM KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England worship, community service and outreach
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 02 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S CHURCH WESTERHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID FOX-BRANCH | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Anna Morris | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret York | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Smart | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Michelle BURMESTER | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Moffat Leather | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sian Secombe | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Leather | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christina Cusick | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Mary Boston | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDY DUFFIELD | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Booker | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN STANLEY WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RODNEY JAMES POMFRET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRUCE SUMNER NUTTALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.80k | £108.02k | £77.66k | £116.33k | £130.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.03k | £95.70k | £88.86k | £109.39k | £189.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.40k | £850 | £1.00k | £2.13k | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 December 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 December 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
St Mary The Virgin
The Green
WESTERHAM
KENT
TN16 1AS
- Phone:
- 01959561330
- Email:
- westerhamchurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window