THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF POPLAR (ALL SAINTS AND ST NICHOLAS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC of All Saints & St. Nicholas has the responsibility of co-operating & planning with the Team Rector, Team Vicar & clergy in promoting our pastoral, evangelistic, educational, social & ecumenical mission in the whole Parish. The charitable objectives of the Parish of Poplar are to serve the spiritual, pastoral & social needs of those who live in the Parish or who worship in our Churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 16 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- PARISH OF POPLAR PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Williams | Chair | 28 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Campbell | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jean Todd | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Larissa Kelly | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Bingham | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Imaikop Mmah | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wall | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Depree | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matt Wall | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MILBANK | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MODUPE KENKU | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA DOWNS | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.09k | £204.58k | £149.17k | £178.20k | £183.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £364.78k | £263.30k | £186.36k | £181.94k | £171.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2024 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 January 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 January 2021 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2M Dee Street
LONDON
E14 0PT
- Phone:
- 02075389198
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window