THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GOSFORTH ST NICHOLAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
religious services and pastoral care, community activities and provision of facilities (buildings and open spaces) for the benefit of the residents of the parish of Gosforth St Nicholas and the wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 28 January 2010: Previously excepted registration
- GOSFORTH ST NICHOLAS PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ruth Alicia Stradling | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Louise Haigh | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane McLaughlin | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Anthony Baker | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ron Black | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr SallyAnn Ritchie | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby John Coulson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Joseph Thirlaway | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Molly Rebecca Allan | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Michael Proudfoot | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tait | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Harrison | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dale Hunter | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM PALMER BARNARD | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Olwyn Black | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Cecilia Holmes | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WHITE OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.80k | £130.20k | £128.37k | £124.25k | £144.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.23k | £143.08k | £146.35k | £144.21k | £164.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2023 | 240 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gosforth Parish Church
Church Road
Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE3 1BJ
- Phone:
- 01912854111
- Email:
- sallyann.ritchie@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window