THE DACAPO MUSIC FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objective is to advance music education and appreciation for children and adults in the United Kingdom, using the DaCapo approach. We provide family music centres, enable in-schools music activities led by classroom teachers using DaCapo methods and also a comprehensive teacher-training programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 2010: Standard registration
- DACAPO (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hong Ding | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giuseppa Colella | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Spreadbury | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sripriya Sreedher | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nell Norman | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Muenger | Trustee | 30 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan McClelland | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
MONICA HEALY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.00k | £268.73k | £247.69k | £300.81k | £359.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.00k | £261.56k | £260.43k | £311.64k | £362.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 9 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE MUSIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, PRIMARILY BY USING THE DACAPO APPROACH TO MUSIC, EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING A FAMILY MUSIC CENTRES B IN-SCHOOL AND OUT-OF-SCHOOL WORKSHOPS AND PROJECTS; AND C A COMPREHENSIVE TEACHER-TRAINING PROGRAMME THE DACAPO APPROACH TO MUSIC EDUCATION CAN BE DEFINED AS AN INCLUSIVE MUSIC TEACHING METHOD BY WHICH EVERY CHILD CAN PARTICIPATE. IT IS A FUSION OF KODALY, U EURYTHMICS AND CHILD-CENTRED LEARNING WHERE THE CHILDREN'S ENJOYMENT IS AS IMPORTANT AS PROGRESSION
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wren Academy
41 Hilton Avenue
LONDON
N12 9HB
- Phone:
- 07342134924
- Email:
- jam@dacapo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window