Financial history WARRANT OFFICERS' AND SENIOR RATINGS' MESS HMS HERON

Charity number: 1133196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £314.62k £164.10k £332.33k £348.15k £334.49k
Total expenditure £305.00k £121.99k £300.88k £398.39k £354.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A