Trustees THE MOLD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity Number: 500708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
joy heard Chair 08 March 2016
None on record
Sarah Colby-Browne Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Christine Bevan Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
LEWIS ANNE Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
bryan webb Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE Mary MCLEAN Trustee 17 March 2013
None on record
Eluned Mair Kaye Trustee 06 March 2010
None on record
Ray G CHESTERS Trustee 01 October 1979
None on record
TEGWEN HUGHES-ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
MRS PAM MILLINGTON Trustee
None on record
JOAN FROST Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE LONG Trustee
None on record
ANN WOODWARD Trustee
None on record
MRS KATH JONES Trustee
None on record