THE FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CURRENTLY RUNNING A SUBSTANTIAL RENEWAL CAMPAIGN ON BEHALF OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL TO COVER MAJOR WORKS TO FABRIC TO ENABLE GREATER COMMUNITY USE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 07 December 2009: Standard registration
- 24 October 2011: Funds received from 1079132 THE FRIENDS OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS...
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Anne Gazzard | Chair | 08 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
The Hon Mrs Diana Mary Nicholson | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Holliday | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Gioia Maria Mingella-Giddens | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rodney Hogg | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
DAVID HUGH BENNISON | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Dr CHARLES NOEL ARKLESS MOBBS | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL HECTOR KIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SIR GUY ACLAND BT LVO DL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.78k | £12.56k | £17.41k | £14.36k | £4.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.42k | £17.25k | £15.20k | £18.05k | £4.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/11/2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE MINSTER CHURCH OF SAINTS THOMAS, NEWPORT, ISLE OF WIGHT, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS, ORGAN AND OTHER CHATTELS AND TO ASSIST THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NEWPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Centre
Town Lane
Newport
PO30 1JU
- Phone:
- 01983 559257
- Email:
- campaign@newportminster.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window