Whitfield Parochial Church Council (Glossop)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is committed to helping the people of St James' and St Luke's churches and Glossop to learn and grow in their understanding of and faith in Jesus Christ. We are committed to sharing God's love in word and action in ways which benefit the people of Glossop and around the world promoting their physical, mental, spiritual, social and economic well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
73 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- WHITFIELD PCC (Working name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITFIELD, GLOSSOP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Chris Neilson | Chair | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Gregory | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Graham Bowes | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan James Edge | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Swindells | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Christopher Galvin | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Williams | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Humphrey | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Collard | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Richardson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hackett | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Eleanor Cahill | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Burston | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Kindleysides | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.50k | £196.74k | £146.39k | £121.77k | £170.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £195.98k | £196.65k | £150.46k | £163.33k | £152.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.80k | £11.40k | £400 | £6.15k | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitfield Parish
The Vineyard
18-20 Charlestown Road
GLOSSOP
Derbyshire
SK13 8JN
- Phone:
- 01457853330
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window