Accounts and annual returns SHAARE EZRA - THE MOSES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 November 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2024 24 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 November 2023 26 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 26 November 2022 19 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 26 November 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2021 20 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 26 November 2020 20 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 November 2020 03 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window