SHAARE EZRA - THE MOSES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants based on applications, predominantly but not exclusively to Jewish individuals and institutions in order to promote the advancement of secular and non-secular education, preserve and protect health, religious activities and other general charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWN TRACEY MOSES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Menasey Marc Moses | Trustee | 26 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL EZRA MOSES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/11/2020 | 26/11/2021 | 26/11/2022 | 26/11/2023 | 26/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.08k | £125.09k | £23.87k | £13.55k | £54.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.14k | £27.21k | £25.91k | £35.35k | £48.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 November 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 November 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 November 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 November 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 November 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 November 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 November 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 November 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT PRIMARILY BY MAKING GRANTS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, JEWISH INDIVIDUALS AND INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD,
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 CRESPIGNY ROAD
LONDON
NW4 3DY
- Phone:
- 02082027221
- Email:
- SHAARE.EZRA@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window