THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARK, CAMBRIDGE.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the whole mission of the Church; liturgical, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST.MARK'S CHURCH, NEWNHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev James Edward Robinson | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Buss | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Richard John Bauckham | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Arthur Miller | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Perry | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ross Woodward Smythe | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Frances Toye Scott | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bethan Rodden | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Frances Marie Miller | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kristine Enriquez Smythe | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shevanti Devika Roser | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Robert HURST | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Anthony PORTER | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannelore Hagele | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HILARY LYNNE MURRAY | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Felicity Coles Banks | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.04k | £197.61k | £128.68k | £169.52k | £202.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.87k | £124.65k | £122.22k | £149.73k | £162.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Treasurer
c/o 16 Crome Ditch CLose
Grantchester
CB3 9NR
- Phone:
- 01223660927
- Email:
- treasurer@stmarksnewnham.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window