THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, CHESTERFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC exists to promote Christian worship within the framework of the Church of England and resides within the Diocese of Derby. In order to fulfil its obligations the PCC provides daily worship at St Mary and All Saints Church and weekly worship at St Leonards Church, Spital. The PCC also provides community facilities enabling local organisations to use the Church Parish Centre for meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 05 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
- CHESTERFIELD PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURENCE JAMES LAYLAND | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC WILLIAM PETER DAVID GAVAN | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY BALL | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY MCGHIE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ALAN BARRAND | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE PATRICIA CRAWSHAW-MOORE | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN CRAWSHAW-MOORE | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN MALCOLM WILKINSON | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev Patrick Francis Coleman | Trustee | 18 July 2014 |
|
|||||
COLIN MCKENNA | Trustee | 29 December 2013 |
|
|||||
LINDA GRETTA WILKINSON | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JOHN GASCOYNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN ERIC HAGUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA MARY BARRETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
NIGEL ROBERT SWANN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £510.83k | £236.46k | £546.57k | £247.88k | £210.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.98k | £285.20k | £642.57k | £238.80k | £217.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £391.72k | N/A | £476.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £110.55k | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £63.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.56k | N/A | £6.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £319.26k | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £179.55k | N/A | £607.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £56.43k | N/A | £35.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | £1.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £250 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 OAKFIELD AVENUE
CHESTERFIELD
S40 3LE
- Phone:
- 01246567674
- Email:
- vicar@crookedspire.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window