LITTLE HAND CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A The relief of poverty, sickness and distress, in particular amongst children in Eastern Europe B The advancement of education, in particular amongst children in Eastern Europe C The promotion of such other purposes, being exclusively charitable, according to the laws of England and Wales as the trustees may from time to time determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Poland
Governance
- 24 March 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 January 2014: Re-registered
- LITTLE HAND / LHCF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES O'NEIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PIERRE LUSSATO MBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 285 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 June 2023 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 21 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST CHILDREN IN EASTERN EUROPE B THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST CHILDREN IN EASTERN EUROPE C THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES, BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
EASTERN EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Spinney
59 Ladder Hill
Wheatley
OXFORD
OX33 1HY
- Phone:
- 01865874878
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window