Trustees WIRRAL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

72 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Noel Henry Clifford Sharp Chair 01 September 2022
WEST KIRBY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 46 days late
Margaret Elizabeth Burrows Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Bekezela Pardon Dima Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Julie Luscombe Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Adrian Stephen Pallant Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Rev Daniel Woodhouse Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Joyce Brenda Scoffield Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Alan Stephen Fowler Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Kevin Neil Mothersdale Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
David Samuel Cross Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Ralph Kitchener Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Rev Ruth Elizabeth Dowson Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Dr Janet Almond Trustee 01 September 2023
PRENTON METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Elaine Phillips Trustee 01 September 2023
WEST KIRBY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 46 days late
Janet Margaret Herd Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Roger John Staines Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Lyn Jackson-Eves Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
Paula Ann Dewhirst Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
STEPHEN HOWARD COOPER Trustee 01 January 2023
LIVERPOOL DISTRICT METHODIST CHURCH
Charity reporting is overdue by 309 days
Lynne Maura Cowell Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record