DELTA ACADEMIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delta Academies Charitable Trust has developed a Foundation Fund, and through the raising of donations and grants. The Fund is designed to assist students in the pursuit of excellence and promote international relations and enterprise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Leeds City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 June 2010: Standard registration
- 19 April 2012: Funds received from 1060376 DON VALLEY HIGH SCHOOL FUND
- SCHOOL PARTNERSHIP TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Tarn | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Pitchfork | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bromage | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.60k | £1 | £12.29k | £632 | £27.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.88k | £1.55k | £9.01k | £7.57k | £17.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 NOV 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; 4.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION THAT ARE PROVIDED AT ALL TIMES OF THE YEAR, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE; AND 4.3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. 4.4 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR SUCH PURPOSES, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING AND DISSEMINATING MODELS OF GOOD PRACTICE AND BY THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SERVICES GENERALLY TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS; AND (B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WHO WORK OR VOLUNTEER IN, OR GOVERN, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THOSE PERSONS TO DELIVER A HIGH QUALITY EDUCATION TO THE PUPILS AND COMMUNITIES SERVED BY THOSE INSTITUTIONS."
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM;
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Delta Academies Trust
Education House
Spawd Bone Lane
Knottingley
Wakefield
- Phone:
- 07535253419
- Email:
- info@deltatrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window