PROUD AND LOUD ARTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proud and Loud Arts is a user led drama group, targeted specifically for young adults with disabilities, aged 16+. Membership does not require any previous acting skills but full participation is expected. Proud and Loud Arts is an educational project, which offers young adults with disabilities a a voice through drama workshops, film making and performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Salford City
Governance
- 08 February 2010: Standard registration
- 28 November 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 28 November 2012: Funds transferred to 1143958 Uncurbed Collective
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.99k | £31.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.46k | £31.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 25 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 25 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 21 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED 20 JANUARY 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF ART AND TO DEVELOP THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF DRAMA. TO HELP MEET THE NEEDS OF YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH THE ABILITY TO EXPRESS THEMSELVES IN A CREATIVE CONTEXT. TO HELP YOUNG DISABLED PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window