THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE NEW THUNDERSLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary activity is the promotion of the Gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ in the Parish of New Thundersley according to the doctines and practices of the Church of England. The PCC co-operates with the Vicar in promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST GEORGE'S PCC NEW THUNDERSLEY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Hillman | Chair | 29 August 2019 |
|
|||||
ANNE NUNN | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Rye | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Nicholas Baker | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Baker | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Geeson | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Rose | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Pinnock | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Mickleburgh | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Volk | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian King | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joy Mickleburgh | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JANE NUNN HILLMAN | Trustee | 17 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.83k | £91.39k | £81.82k | £85.78k | £84.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.25k | £63.31k | £68.46k | £156.73k | £84.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 May 2021 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 May 2021 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 LAMBETH ROAD
BENFLEET
SS7 4BN
- Phone:
- 01268750362
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window