Financial history WINCHMORE HILL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1134122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £112.04k £69.00k £75.74k £75.61k £82.92k
Total expenditure £92.84k £78.00k £71.46k £86.67k £80.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A