PARISH OF ABERYSTWYTH PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of regular public worship, of sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation.Pastoral work & visiting the sick & the bereaved.Teaching of Christianity through sermons, small groups & school assemblies.Providing a youth club with Christian ethos.Promoting the whole mission of the Church in Wales community cohesion of activities for older people, parents&toddlers & other specific groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£598,306
Donations and legacies | £367.00k | |
Charitable activities | £27.99k | |
Other trading activities | £2.03k | |
Investments | £68.88k | |
Other | £132.41k |
Total expenditure:
£646,386
Raising funds | £2.22k | |
Charitable activities | £644.16k | |
Other | £0 |
£3,002 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.22k | |
Charitable expenditure | £644.16k |
People

7 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ceredigion
Governance
- 11 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN HENLEY | Chair | 25 February 2013 |
|
|||||
Mandy Rowe | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Avril Lynn Morris | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rebecca Evans | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Norris McBride | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Lavinia Clissold | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Lynton Medhurst | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gordon Henley | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew John Starr | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ceirion James Rees | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Revd Dr Elizabeth Mary Rees | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Malcolm Dye | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorena Kathryn Troughton | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rolant John Ellis | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Dora Ann Jones | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Canon Mark Stephen Ansell | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Peter John Bunting | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Wilkinson | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MS MARY PLATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Enid Elizabeth Welsh | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Robert Davies | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £520.27k | £541.70k | £412.22k | £653.22k | £598.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £556.89k | £408.62k | £390.24k | £518.27k | £646.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.43k | N/A | £9.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £404.18k | £442.80k | N/A | £553.14k | £367.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £7.96k | £1.46k | N/A | £1.58k | £2.03k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £25.27k | £78.01k | N/A | £25.99k | £27.99k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £72.31k | £4.06k | N/A | £66.64k | £68.88k | |
|
Income - Other | £10.55k | £15.38k | N/A | £5.86k | £132.41k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.33k | £50.00k | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £403.64k | £319.47k | N/A | £439.81k | £644.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £153.25k | £89.14k | N/A | £78.46k | £2.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.62k | £7.57k | N/A | £7.40k | £10.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £8.78k | £56.47k | N/A | £39.14k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £81.11k | £89.14k | N/A | £77.02k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £437.88k | £425.63k | N/A | £426.57k | £341.29k | |
|
Long-term investments | £51.26k | £54.37k | N/A | £53.81k | £56.81k | |
|
Other assets | £208.07k | £349.27k | N/A | £535.58k | £547.51k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £126.41k | £122.27k | N/A | £152.60k | £127.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michaels Church
Laura Place
ABERYSTWYTH
SY23 2AU
- Phone:
- 01970617184
- Email:
- office@stmikes.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window