THE ONLINE RADIO BROADCASTING FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE AIM TO FURTHER EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO POOR YOUNG PEOPLE, RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGES AND ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP BY FACILITATING VOLUNTEERING BY YOUNG PEOPLE FOR PROJECTS OR EVENTS CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2009: Standard registration
- THE STUDYVOX FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Iain Rawlinson | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEVIN ST JOHN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARA MATHEW MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2022 | 733 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/01/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): A TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE TO POOR STUDENTS; B TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; C TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP BY ASSISTING, ENCOURAGING OR FACILITATING VOLUNTEERING BY YOUNG PERSONS TO TAKE PART IN PROJECTS PURPOSES OR EVENTS THAT ARE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lodge Farm
Lodge Lane
Beaulieu
BROCKENHURST
SO42 7XP
- Phone:
- 01590 611200
- Email:
- iain@rawlinsonpartners.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window