CHILDRENS ASSOSCIATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps to prevent or relieve poverty of exposed children and young people primarily in the Philippines, to advance their quality of life through provision of grants, items and services covering the needs of individuals in need and charities or other organisations working to relieve poverty. The charity assists in the provision of education, training and healthcare projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Philippines
Governance
- 30 March 2010: Standard registration
- 02 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHILDRENS ASSOSCIATION LIMITED (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.92k | £14.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.92k | £14.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 03 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 26 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OF EXTREMELY EXPOSED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY IN THE PHILIPPINES IN ORDER TO ADVANCE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES COVERING PRIMARY AND SECONDARY NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; B. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEVE OF POVERTY SUFFERED BY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BECOME SELF-SUFFICIENT; C. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE PROPERTY THROUGH UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS WHERE THE CHARITY OPERATES; D. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD;
Area of benefit
PHILIPPINES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window