RIDLEY HALL EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith according to Baptist principles and in accordance with its constitution. The charity may further such other purposes which are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales as the Charity Trustees consider to be compatible with the principal object.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 19 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR PETER ERNEST ANDREWS | Chair | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Fabio Jose Da Cruz Correia Da Silva Silva | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suleyman Osman Huseyin | Trustee | 16 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.06k | £77.92k | £73.53k | £71.53k | £68.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.30k | £53.03k | £38.85k | £38.56k | £47.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES CONSIDER IN THEIR DISCRETION TO BE COMPATIBLE WITH THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT, WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ridley Hall Evangelical Church
Broughton Street
Battersea
London
SW8 3RD
- Phone:
- 02077201819
- Email:
- office.ridleyhall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window