THE GILLINGHAM COMMUNITY AND LEISURE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A subsidiary of the Three Rivers Partnership, Dorset , the Trust was established to manage development construction of the RiversMeet Centre (opened in August 2010) and thereafter to manage the facilities to promote public benefit of community participation in healthy recreation and such other lawful charitable purposes for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,597,562
Donations and legacies | £16.05k | |
Charitable activities | £1.32m | |
Other trading activities | £258.29k | |
Investments | £1.07k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,791,074
Raising funds | £126.84k | |
Charitable activities | £1.66m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £16,048 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £126.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.66m |
People

75 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 26 October 2010: Standard registration
- GCLT (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Douglas Silvester CBE | Chair | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SIMON VIVIAN CHASE | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Michael Brian Chapman | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Day | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Garrath Charles Pledger | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Ward | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Howard Messer | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £839.24k | £1.52m | £1.53m | £1.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21m | £1.00m | £1.39m | £1.68m | £1.79m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £113.15k | £302.37k | £34.08k | £9.80k | £16.05k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £35.00k | £40.58k | £9.80k | £16.05k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £152.07k | £45.45k | £212.90k | £363.19k | £258.29k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £827.48k | £456.40k | £1.02m | £1.16m | £1.32m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £47 | £20 | £16 | £253 | £1.07k | |
|
Income - Other | £113.15k | £302.37k | £242.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.13m | £957.06k | £1.21m | £1.52m | £1.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £86.92k | £29.11k | £91.53k | £154.02k | £126.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.31k | £6.30k | £8.08k | £8.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £16.71k | £87.71k | £7.58k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.59m | £4.47m | £4.34m | £4.38m | £4.39m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £287.24k | £353.39k | £397.22k | £76.11k | £106.81k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £931.84k | £1.05m | £823.62k | £689.68k | £931.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 July 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 July 2022 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 8 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GILLINGHAM, DORSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SWIMMING, BASKETBALL, BADMINTON, NETBALL, INDOOR HOCKEY, FIVE-A-SIDE FOOTBALL, GYMNASTICS AND FITNESS EXERCISES AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE HEALTHY RECREATIONAL SPORTS OR ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; AND 2 SUCH OTHER LAW CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
GILLINGHAM, DORSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERSMEET
HARDINGS LANE
GILLINGHAM
DORSET
SP8 4HX
- Phone:
- 07717172446
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window