Financial history CA ENGLAND & WALES

Charity number: 1136200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £29.48k £55.52k £82.94k £74.11k £68.99k
Total expenditure £22.06k £50.52k £93.06k £86.10k £50.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A