NORTHERN LINCOLNSHIRE CLINICAL SPORTS PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Northern Lincolnshire Clinical Sports Partnership provides access to healthcare services to the sporting community, we do this by providing direct clinical support, enhancing education by the provision of medical and first aid training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 May 2010: Standard registration
- NLCSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW TODD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Nader Rizk | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|||||
ALAN WELSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR THE SPORTING COMMUNITY LIVING IN NORTHERN LINCOLNSHIRE PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND HEALTH RELATED AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF A ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS B ADVANCING EDUCATION C PROVIDING ACCESS TO FREE AND/OR SUBSIDISED HEALTHCARE TO REDUCE INJURY AND PROMOTE HEALTH AND FITNESS THOUGHT SPORT D PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
NORTHERN LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 Manor Road
Bottesford
Scunthorpe
DN16 3PB
- Phone:
- 07712389239
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window